THE BRAIN TUMOUR CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Brain Tumour Charity is at the forefront of the fight to defeat brain tumours, making a difference every day to the lives of people with a brain tumour and their families. We are committed to having the biggest possible impact for everyone affected by a brain tumour, to defending the most amazing part of the human body, so that the diagnosis of a brain tumour is no longer a death sentence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£14,195,000
Donations and legacies | £12.63m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £1.00m | |
Investments | £563.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£14,659,000
Raising funds | £3.16m | |
Charitable activities | £11.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£764,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £82,785 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.16m | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.50m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.16m | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.50m | |
Retained for future use | £300.00k |
People

116 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
1000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 December 2012: Standard registration
- 01 June 2020: Funds received from 1131071 THE ETHAN PERKINS TRUST
- 17 November 2021: Funds received from 1115377 FRIENDS OF OSCAR (OFFERING SUPPORT TO CHILDREN AND...
- 18 December 2023: Funds received from 1119259 THE BRIAN CROSS MEMORIAL TRUST
- 16 February 2024: Funds received from 1014220 WHITTINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST
- TBTF (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACK ANTHONY MORRIS CBE | Chair | 29 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Rachel Suzanne Edgar | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matimba Charity Swana | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Ann Conroy | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Russell Michael Hagan | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Rhian Jarvis | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sukhdip Sandhu | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Steel | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kieran Richard Palmer | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elena Bechberger | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.31m | £8.30m | £11.48m | £12.72m | £14.20m | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.56m | £11.33m | £10.63m | £11.24m | £14.66m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £329.00k | £529.00k | £540.00k | £82.79k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £10.36m | £7.76m | £10.96m | £11.97m | £12.63m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £554.00k | £186.00k | £193.00k | £363.00k | £1.00m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £398.00k | £355.00k | £325.00k | £383.00k | £563.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £155.00k | £516.00k | £1.02m | £930.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £10.36m | £9.59m | £8.75m | £8.31m | £11.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.20m | £1.74m | £1.87m | £2.92m | £3.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £91.00k | £80.00k | £65.00k | £84.00k | £82.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £4.82m | £5.45m | £5.08m | £3.89m | £5.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £38.58k | £30.00k | £17.00k | £27.00k | £23.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £71.00k | £315.00k | £282.00k | £251.00k | £222.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £12.03m | £14.65m | £14.54m | £13.84m | £14.64m | |
|
Other assets | £8.04m | £5.44m | £6.07m | £6.29m | £5.01m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £12.91m | £13.55m | £13.27m | £12.15m | £11.34m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/05/2013
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT AND SOCIAL CONSEQUENCES OF TUMOURS OF THE BRAIN AND CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 2)THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING OF PEOPLE WITH TUMOURS OF THE BRAIN AND NERVOUS SYSTEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND SUPPORT SERVICES TO THEM;AND 3.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO TUMOURS OF THE BRAIN AND CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Brain Tumour Charity
Fleet 27
Rye Close
FLEET
Hampshire
GU51 2UH
- Phone:
- 01252749990
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window