UMN SUPPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UMNST is an independent Christian charity focusing on addressing poverty primarily in Nepal by in particular, but not solely, promoting the charitable purposes of United Mission to Nepal an INGO that has worked only in Nepal for over sixty years to alleviate poverty, and its 50+ Nepali registered partner organisations and its two hospitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nepal
Governance
- 30 April 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR MARK GALPIN | Chair | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anne Trimble | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dhana Lama | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stuart Lockwood | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Andrew Rodgers | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Joel Andrew Hafvenstein | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN PENN | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/09/2019 | 17/09/2020 | 17/09/2021 | 17/09/2022 | 17/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.03k | £281.45k | £755.42k | £139.97k | £192.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.53k | £38.12k | £964.70k | £130.31k | £170.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £745.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £341 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £9.81k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £964.70k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £964.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 September 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 17 September 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 17 September 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 17 September 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 17 September 2019 | 15 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2019 | 15 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 SEP 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: (A)(I)TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEPAL AND ELSEWHERE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS OR AS A RESULT OF CONFLICT, DIRECTLY AND THROUGH THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY, AND IN SO DOING TO DEMONSTRATE THE CHRISTIAN COMMITMENT OF THE CHARITY'S MEMBERS AND STAFF; (II) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND HEALTH IN NEPAL AND ELSEWHERE; AND (III) IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH UMN AND TO RAISE AND ADMINISTER FUNDS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES. (B) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 The Meadows
DUNGANNON
County Tyrone
BT71 6PW
- Phone:
- 02887727668
- Email:
- info@umnsupporttrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window