Financial history HAMBLEDON NURSERY SCHOOL LTD

Charity number: 1151174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £213.20k £215.91k £233.22k £279.77k £306.29k
Total expenditure £203.47k £216.69k £240.80k £266.67k £300.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £91.70k £91.90k £89.28k £105.48k £115.56k