Financial history CHARLES AND JULIA HENRY FUND

Charity Number: 1155582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £224.79k £174.76k £206.68k £368.60k £400.72k
Total expenditure £185.15k £320.75k £264.02k £293.12k £277.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A