Financial history CHORLEY METHODIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1151134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £90.11k £80.84k £86.44k £97.50k £86.65k
Total expenditure £89.20k £77.83k £81.28k £69.69k £100.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £246 N/A N/A