NEW FOREST BASICS BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing - 1. food and other essentials to families and individuals referred by social work agencies in the New Forest District 2. goods, services and discretionary grants in association with a referral agency 3. practical guidance and training for local people to improve budgeting of limited resources, and to maintain a healthy diet and lifestyle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £18,000 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
180 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 13 December 2012: Standard registration
- BASICS BANK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Stanley | Chair | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Richards | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Winnington | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Douglas James Knight | Trustee | 20 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Diana Peck | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Naida Jane Tudor | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Cooke-Hurle | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony da Cunha | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.78k | £259.73k | £206.55k | £258.95k | £235.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.75k | £178.65k | £188.72k | £212.69k | £222.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £95.00k | N/A | £12.68k | £17.18k | £18.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 18/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
GUIDED BY THE CHRISTIAN ETHOS EXPRESSING GOD'S LOVE IN ACTION, THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE NEW FOREST DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREA - (1) BY PROVIDING FOOD AND OTHER ESSENTIALS TO FAMILIES AND INDIVIDUALS REFERRED TO THE CHARITY BY RECOGNISED SOCIAL WORK AGENCIES, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, COMMUNITY BODIES, CHURCHES, CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHOSE PURPOSE INCLUDES THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ("THE REFERRAL AGENCIES"); (2) BY PROVIDING GOODS, SERVICES AND DISCRETIONARY GRANTS IN ASSOCIATION WITH ANY OF THE REFERRAL AGENCIES; (3) BY PROVIDING, EITHER BY ITSELF OR IN ASSOCIATION WITH ANOTHER ORGANISATION, PRACTICAL GUIDANCE AND TRAINING FOR LOCAL PEOPLE TO IMPROVE BUDGETING OF THEIR LIMITED RESOURCES, AND TO MAINTAIN A HEALTHY DIET AND LIFESTYLE. (4) BY DISPOSAL OF FOOD GOODS OR STOCK, WHICH THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER TO BE SURPLUS TO REQUIREMENTS, TO A CHARITY OR OTHER ORGANISATION WHOSE PURPOSES INCLUDE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. THE CHARITY WILL PROVIDE THESE SERVICES FREELY, IMPARTIALLY, CONFIDENTIALLY AND NON-JUDGMENTALLY, IRRESPECTIVE OF RELIGIOUS OPINION, RACE, NATIONALITY, COLOUR, GENDER, AGE, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR POLITICAL OPINION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Forest Basics Bank
Cannon Street East Car Park
Lymington
Hampshire
SO41 9BR
- Phone:
- 01590610008
- Email:
- info@basicsbank.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window