Accounts and annual returns 1ST WINDERMERE SEA SCOUT GROUP (TL/2374)

Charity number: 503311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2024 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required