Financial history 1ST WINDERMERE SEA SCOUT GROUP (TL/2374)

Charity number: 503311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.94k £20.00k £12.51k £15.90k £9.20k
Total expenditure £14.94k £6.00k £14.68k £16.00k £7.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.00k £1.25k N/A N/A