Financial history ACTIVATE RAWMARSH

Charity number: 1150274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £111.94k £74.19k £115.98k £49.46k £139.83k
Total expenditure £85.74k £75.63k £86.37k £82.63k £85.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.27k N/A £28.61k £36.67k