FRIENDS OF SMYRNA HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian Faith in such ways and in such parts of India and the world as the trustees may from time to time think fit; and to relieve sickness, poverty and hardship among children and people living in India and elsewhere by the provision of shelter, food, health, education and other such charitable services as the trustees from time to time deem appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- India
Governance
- 08 January 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH FRANK MORGAN | Chair | 18 December 2012 |
|
|||||
David Hines | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Smith | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Dodsworth | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emily Dodsworth | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY MICHAEL NEAL | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD NEIL JAMES SNELLING | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.90k | £34.27k | £35.61k | £34.50k | £27.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.11k | £45.23k | £38.25k | £34.01k | £30.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 DEC 2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY?S OBJECTS (?THE OBJECTS?) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF INDIA AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND HARDSHIP AMONG CHILDREN AND PEOPLE LIVING IN INDIA AND ELSEWHERE BY THE PROVISION OF SHELTER, FOOD, HEALTH, EDUCATION AND OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4a 80 High Street
Egham
TW20 9HE
- Phone:
- 07836567845
- Email:
- info@friendsofsmyrnahome.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window