FRIENDS OF BUNGAY COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising to help secure future operations. Raising finance for improvements to library building and services, including the provision of free WiFi. Funding extended opening hours. Funding and support for children's activities at weekends and in holiday periods. Support for community social activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 15 April 2013: CIO registration
- BCL (Working name)
- BUNGAY COMMUNITY LIBRARY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Ann Douglas | Chair | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
SYLVIA MARY KNIGHTS | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JUDY CLOKE | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Maxine Anne Williams | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Weaver | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Birkinshaw | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda King | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.25k | £5.70k | £6.17k | £8.17k | £14.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.29k | £5.42k | £2.54k | £5.74k | £14.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 August 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 09 August 2022 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Apr 2013
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN BUNGAY, SUFFOLK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A LENDING LIBRARY; 2. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BUNGAY, SUFFOLK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUNGAY LIBRARY
WHARTON STREET
BUNGAY
SUFFOLK
NR35 1EL
- Phone:
- 01986892748
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window