THE DEMENTIA ADVENTURE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Dementia Adventure Trust works towards making adventurous activities possible for people living with dementia and their carers, believing in the benefits to be gained from regular, active engagement with the natural world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 June 2013: Standard registration
- 04 October 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 October 2016: Funds transferred to 1163163 DEMENTIA ADVENTURE TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.26k | £47.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £875 | £20.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 29 July 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 April 2014 | 23 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/12/2012 AS AMENDED ON 09/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA, AND THEIR CARERS BY: (1) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS, OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES AND OTHER SUPPORT. (2) PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE BENEFITS OF ACTIVITIES WHICH ASSIST IN FURTHERING THE OBJECTS AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window