ROTHERHAM CANCER CARE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and need, the preservation of health for sufferers of all forms of cancer and other life threatening diseases and their families and carers in Rotherham area through the provision of a support centre offfering information, professional counselling and complementary therapies. The provision of one to one assessment and therapy to individuals affected by cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 18 February 2013: Standard registration
- 14 June 2013: Funds received from 1147653 ROTHERHAM CANCER CARE CENTRE
- Maples Cancer Care (Working name)
- RCCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stephen Brian Burns | Chair | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jodie Rose Goodall | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Julia Jones | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Babar Nazir | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jeanette Mallinder | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Ruth Carr | Trustee | 29 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.22k | £57.95k | £134.94k | £125.42k | £138.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.78k | £30.83k | £144.44k | £136.06k | £150.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/09/2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND NEED, THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH FOR SUFFERERS OF ALL FORMS OF CANCER AND OTHER LIFE THREATENING DISEASES, AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN THE ROTHERHAM AREA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A SUPPORT CENTRE OFFERING INFORMATION, PROFESSIONAL COUNSELLING AND COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES.
Area of benefit
ROTHERHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Stafford Drive
ROTHERHAM
South Yorkshire
S60 3DQ
- Phone:
- 01709375729
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window