Financial history LOCKSWOOD COMMUNITY AND SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1151561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £87.40k £77.16k £87.91k £111.09k £127.58k
Total expenditure £73.95k £83.86k £83.83k £94.49k £132.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.43k N/A N/A £5.00k