NEWARK HERITAGE BARGE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Own and maintain the historic barge LEICESTER TRADER as a heritage and learning centre for the navigation and trade of the River Trent and the people who worked the barges. The barge dates from 1953 and acts as a floating museum based at Newark, where it is open to the public on a seasonal basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 17 May 2013: CIO registration
- NEWARK HERITAGE BARGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES WILKINSON | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul Ainsworth | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE GEORGE REID | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH CATLEY | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY ANNE BRITTON | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.48k | £2.44k | £5.37k | £2.42k | £2.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £2.05k | £2.34k | £2.52k | £4.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 May 2013
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF THE LAST REMAINING DUMB BARGE OF THE TRENT (KNOWN AS THE LEICESTER TRADER) FOR PRESENT AND FUTURE GENERATIONS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORICAL HERITAGE OF THE RIVER TRENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A HERITAGE CENTRE ABROAD THE LEICESTER TRADER AND THE COLLECTION AND DISPLAY OF HISTORIC ARTEFACTS AND ARCHIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 The Weavers
NEWARK
Nottinghamshire
NG24 4RY
- Phone:
- 07971 589612
- Email:
- les.nhbarge@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
WWW.newarkheritagebarge.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window