SOUTHWOLD SAILORS' READING ROOM ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Southwold Sailors' Reading Room was built in 1864 as a refuge for fishermen and mariners when not engaged at sea. Displays of a seafaring nature line the walls and fill glass cabinets. Pictures and portraits of local fishermen and seascapes, model ships and maritime paraphernalia offer a fascinating history of Southwold's connections with the sea.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Elizabeth Baker | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS JAMES RITSON BRIGHT | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WELLS | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Michael Ladd | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM ROY DENNY | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.98k | £18.83k | £11.00k | £18.35k | £20.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.96k | £8.96k | £11.55k | £15.48k | £13.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JAN 2013
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR AGED AND NEEDY SAILORS IN SOUTHWOLD AND SUBJECT THERETO FOR THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTHWOLD AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE INTENDED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southwold Sailors' Reading Room
East Cliff
SOUTHWOLD
Suffolk
IP18 6EL
- Phone:
- 00
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window