THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARYS, EASEBOURNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church mission activities In response to the new Diocesan Strategy the focus will be on financial stability, numerical growth and support the common good in each benefice Plans are in place to run a "Christianity Explored" course with the Midhurst Parish Church in the spring of 2016
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 03 April 2013: Previously excepted registration
- 17 September 2024: Funds received from 207285 COWDRAY LIVINGS TRUST
- ST MARY'S PCC, EASEBOURNE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND DEREK BRIAN WELSMAN | Chair | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Trish Slade | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Adams | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Tree | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Marsh | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Colman | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Sankey | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deryck Hamon | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Drayson | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Todd | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Howkins | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Pack | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Stringer | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROGER CHARLES BRICKNELL | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON TREACHER DAVIS | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ERIC LESLIE BOUNTON | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.70k | £84.26k | £149.76k | £220.64k | £179.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.80k | £92.33k | £122.94k | £136.33k | £291.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2024 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2024 | 260 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northgate
Dodsley Grove
Easebourne
MIDHURST
West Sussex
GU29 9BE
- Phone:
- 01730816405
- Email:
- derek.welsman@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window