SOUTHWELL MUSIC FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Southwell Music Festival istaking place for the first time in 2014,and is planned as an annual, top-quality classical music festival, to celebrate classical music, and to raise the profile of the town and its magnificent mediaeval Minster. The Festival performances will be centred at Southwell Minster, and in the historic Great Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 30 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristin Eleanor McIntosh | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stephen Garrood | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Farr | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH HALL | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Carris Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Massey | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Flynn John Brayn Le Brocq | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr MARGARET CHADWICK | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.98k | £178.21k | £180.63k | £187.41k | £193.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.97k | £174.19k | £188.21k | £163.56k | £192.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £47.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 MAR 2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC SPEECH DRAMA AND DANCE BY THE PRESENTATION OF AN ANNUAL MUSIC FESTIVAL PREDOMINANTLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SOUTHWELL, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 EASTHORPE
SOUTHWELL
NG25 0HY
- Phone:
- 01636330014
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window