INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR HEALTH AND HUMAN RIGHTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ICHHR focuses on the intersection of international human rights law and health/well-being. We provide independent, interdisciplinary research and consultancy to guide policy-makers, service commissioners, providers and practitioners in implementing and monitoring the rights to health and rehabilitation for survivors of human rights violations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- ICHHR (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.02k | £61.10k | £153.05k | £25.74k | £26.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.63k | £43.29k | £60.07k | £57.29k | £65.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 30 January 2022 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 30 January 2022 | 33 days late | |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 January 2022 | 397 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 30 January 2022 | 397 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Sep 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS, IN PARTICULAR THE UN CONVENTION AGAINST TORTURE) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: - MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; - SUPPORTING THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE, INCLUDING THROUGH OBTAINING REHABILITATION AND REDRESS FOR SUCH INDIVIDUALS - RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; - PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS, INCLUDING NGO'S AND PUBLIC BODIES ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; - CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; - COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; - RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; - INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window