ALL-ABOARD! WATER SPORT AND WATER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITY (BRISTOL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides the equipment, facilities and personnel to enable disabled, underprivileged people in Bristol and adjoining post code areas, to participate in various forms of water sports and water recreational activities. It also provides the opportunity for the community in general to take part in water sport activity for the purpose of their health and welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 25 March 2013: CIO registration
- 26 February 2015: Funds received from 1072459 THE DURSTON CHARITABLE TRUST
- All Aboard (Working name)
- All Aboard Water Sports (Working name)
- All Aboard Watersports (Working name)
- ALL ABOARD WATERSPORTS & WATER RECREATION ACTION (BRISTOL) (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony John Cherry | Chair | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Truss | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clay | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Weeks | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Dursley | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253.13k | £217.72k | £301.47k | £294.20k | £327.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £317.64k | £213.06k | £244.44k | £249.43k | £272.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £49.48k | £34.28k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Mar 2013
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PARTICIPATION IN WATER SPORTS AND SUCH OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES, OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2)TO PROVIDE TRANSPORT FACILITIES IN BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE THEY ARE ELDERLY, POOR OR DISABLED, PEOPLE WITH YOUNG CHILDREN OR THOSE LIVING IN ISOLATED AREAS WHERE THERE ARE NO ADEQUATE PUBLIC TRANSPORT FACILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE THE ACTIVITIES PROVIDED BY THE CIO.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Aboard Water Sports
Baltic Wharf
Cumberland Road
BRISTOL
BS1 6XG
- Phone:
- 01179290801
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window