WINCHESTER ACTION ON CLIMATE CHANGE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Winchester Action on Climate Change Ltd (WinACC) works to cut the carbon footprint of Winchester district, creating lower energy bills, healthier lifestyles and stronger communities. We are local residents, businesses and policy-makers, working together to tread more lightly on the planet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,070 from 2 government contract(s) and £10,858 from 5 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 February 2013: Standard registration
- WINACC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Ruth Jones | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Meredith Meredith | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Paul Yarnall | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Henriette Stolle | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Drysdale Jackson | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Anthony Hugh McNaughtan | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel John Lee | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Holloway | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Felicity Gooding | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.88k | £68.90k | £123.45k | £107.21k | £143.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.28k | £67.14k | £92.55k | £149.19k | £136.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.07k | £22.07k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £1.70k | £2.85k | £11.67k | £10.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/03/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATED TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE EFFECTIVE REDUCTION OF GREEN HOUSE GASES AND LOW CARBON LIVING. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS". 2) TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND IMPROVE THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE UNIVERSITY OF WINCHESTER
SPARKFORD ROAD
WINCHESTER
SO22 4NR
- Phone:
- 01962827083
- Email:
- contactus@winacc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window