THE GIFTED ORGANISATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Gifted uses interactive workshops and podcasting to raise the aspirations of children and young people by improving their knowledge, communication skills and building their confidence. The Gifted works with children, young people and families, particularly disadvantaged/vulnerable to educate and empower them, improve their resilience, confidence, sense of purpose, skills and employability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £26,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 March 2013: Standard registration
- THE GIFTED (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sonia Harris | Chair | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Kumi | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Boyd | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.71k | £207.90k | £166.46k | £171.83k | £121.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.99k | £209.87k | £159.62k | £195.56k | £121.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £38.84k | £26.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/01/2013 as amended on 27 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HEALTH, WELLBEING, LIFE SKILLS AND SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ALL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 5 AND 25, ESPECIALLY THOSE AT RISK OF BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO HAVE BECOME SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, COACHING AND OUTREACH SO AS TO IMPROVE THEIR SKILLS, CONFIDENCE AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE,"SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 5 AND 25 WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; RACE; GENDER; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; DISABILITY OR ETHNIC ORIGIN".
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Ingram House
Cheshunt
Waltham Cross
EN8 9NH
- Phone:
- 01992 623 888
- Email:
- info@thegifted.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window