Financial history EALING LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1151243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £378.07k £526.79k £471.87k £576.59k £570.60k
Total expenditure £375.93k £419.23k £490.98k £530.99k £564.27k
Income from government contracts £5.50k N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A £10.14k N/A £31.29k £5.99k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £453.66k N/A £324.98k £235.84k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £40.47k N/A £251.17k £291.32k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £440 £1.14k
Income - Other N/A £32.67k N/A £0 £42.30k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £419.23k N/A £530.99k £564.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £84.63k N/A £0 £5.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0