Financial history THE AUBREY ORCHARD-LISLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1151335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £103.64k £79.38k £94.41k £102.56k £104.36k
Total expenditure £95.38k £185.00k £83.98k £94.03k £91.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A