Financial history NORWOOD & BRIXTON FOODBANK LIMITED

Charity number: 1151274
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £296.80k £859.63k £649.71k £961.48k £1.18m
Total expenditure £236.92k £556.41k £499.17k £869.74k £1.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £70.50k £75.00k £235.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £560.14k £391.35k £535.57k £781.08k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £297.52k £258.36k £425.91k £385.23k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £1.97k £0 £0 £10.43k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £184.68k £421.76k £248.18k £414.17k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £74.21k £77.42k £116.75k £194.38k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £253 £613 £3.19k £16.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £297.52k £0 £504.81k £513.16k