SPECTRUM PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spectrum People focuses on social inclusion programmes and develops 'meaningful activities' that are delivered in partnership with other local charities and enterprises. Cookery programs, allotment projects, fitness schemes and creative arts projects are all examples of meaningful activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 June 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
USMAN ALI | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Adrian Thomas Atkinson | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rosalind Merryn Hill | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jayne Louise Beecham | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Box | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
JOHN MAJOR | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Pepper | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Richard Ernest George Sloan | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr LINDA HARRIS | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
STEVEN PETER MICHAEL | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.61k | £216.87k | £219.77k | £284.03k | £256.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.32k | £153.55k | £258.21k | £277.07k | £226.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.20k | £25.00k | N/A | £50.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 FEB 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE PRINCIPALLY IN THE COUNTY OF YORKSHIRE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY:- (1) PROVIDING TRAINING, EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO MAXIMISE WELL BEING, EDUCATION, EMPLOYMENT AND VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES; (2) PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, TRAINING AND GENERAL SUPPORT; (3) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR SUCH PEOPLE; AND (4) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING SUCH PEOPLE, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; HOMELESSNESS; DISABILITY; PREVIOUS CRIMINAL CONVICTIONS; OR GENERALLY DUE TO THEIR PERSONAL, SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC POSITION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
One Navigation Walk
Hebble Wharf
Wakefield
WF1 5RH
- Phone:
- 01924311400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window