WEST BERKS FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve persons in West Berkshire and local surrounding areas who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress by providing free food, and in such other ways as the trustees from time to time think fit, and also in other parts of the United Kingdom and in such ways as the trustees from time to time think fit, thereby demonstrating the love of Jesus Christ for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 13 May 2013: CIO registration
- (FORMERLY NEWBURY AND THATCHAM FOOD BANK) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Peter Michael Digby Collins | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Hoaen | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillip John Bevan | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Alexander James Herd | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jason Paul Collis | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.80k | £205.31k | £132.60k | £272.66k | £273.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.59k | £103.49k | £97.03k | £129.81k | £201.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 13 May 2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN WEST BERKSHIRE AND LOCAL SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY PROVIDING FREE FOOD AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, THEREBY DEMONSTRATING THE LOVE OF JESUS CHRIST FOR ALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Cowslip Crescent
THATCHAM
Berkshire
RG18 4DF
- Phone:
- 01635872538
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window