Trustees HERRIOT HOSPICE HOMECARE

Charity number: 1151298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Wren Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Andy Makin Trustee 26 June 2024
None on record
Becky Fitzpatrick Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
Catherine Rustomji Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
Clare Hedges Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Tim Milburn Trustee 19 October 2023
None on record
Professor Brendan Gough Trustee 18 January 2022
NORTH YORKSHIRE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time
JUST B BEREAVEMENT AND MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT
Recently registered
Joanne Crewe Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record