LET'S BEAT NETS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
I The money raised is used to further research into potential treatments for those suffering from Neuro-Endocrine Tumours and for the support of other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.24k | £4.48k | £361 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £205 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 April 2022 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 April 2022 | 448 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE THOSE SUFFERING FROM OR AFFECTED BY NEURO-ENDOCRINE TUMOURS IN PARTICULAR BY: A) PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO ANY CHARITY OR EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT IN THE UK OR EUROPE IN SUCH A WAY AS IS CONSISTENT WITH CHARITY LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES B) RAISING AWARENESS OF NEURO-ENDOCRINE TUMOURS AND THEIR SYMPTOMS C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO NEURO-ENDOCRINE TUMOURS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window