Financial history Christ Church with St Andrew the Less Cambridge

Charity number: 1151611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £666.27k £721.32k £688.87k £796.78k £788.17k
Total expenditure £600.73k £691.14k £721.04k £827.09k £800.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £589.81k £631.15k £628.52k £728.72k £722.65k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £705 £3.27k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £75.63k £89.46k £56.73k £65.43k £40.29k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £359 £686 £671
Income - Other £830 £0 £0 £1.95k £24.56k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £599.86k £691.14k £721.04k £827.09k £800.49k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £1.02k £900 £960 £900
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £22.30k £28.70k £28.30k £50.78k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £879 £0 £0 £0 £0