Financial history CENTRAL AND EAST NORTHAMPTONSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity Number: 1151555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.10m £1.03m £949.95k £773.33k £0
Total expenditure £1.10m £1.02m £1.09m £797.44k £0
Income from government contracts £10.42k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £115.47k N/A £130.00k £486.13k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.52k £176 £80 £1.77k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.07m £1.02m £940.02k £769.58k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £231 £5 £18 £0 N/A
Income - Other £12.39k £6.00k £9.83k £1.98k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.02m £1.09m £797.44k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £33.07k £0 £0 £1.58k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A