FRIENDS OF THE COLLEGIATE CHURCH OF ST MARY, WARWICK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACTIVITIES ASSOCIATED WITH THE COLLEGIATE CHURCH OF ST MARY CHURCH, WARWICK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 30 January 1975: Standard registration
- 01 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 01 February 2022: Funds transferred to 1128087 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
- FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S, WARWICK (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.97k | £3.33k | £1.99k | £2.41k | £11.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.59k | £1.08k | £28.49k | £1.15k | £20.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 16 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JULY 1974 AS AMENDED 6 SEPTEMBER 1986, 5 SEPTEMBER 1992 AND 8 MARCH 1997 AND APRIL 2002 AND 28 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
CARING FOR, ADORNING AND PRESERVING THE CHURCH TOGETHER WITH ITS GOODS AND ORNAMENTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF THE ABOVE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window