JUST BE A CHILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
JBAC enables Kenyan children to experience childhood through the provision of for example books and toys, facilitation of trips to local interest sites, building of playgrounds and open air libraries, improving schools and play areas and organising matches and games.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
254 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
- Kenya
Governance
- 23 August 2013: Standard registration
- JBAC, 10X10 CHALLENGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Margaret Lang | Chair | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Riddhi Thakrar | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kiran Banerjee | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Kaley | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine SULEIMAN | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Caroline Pears | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
DIANE BUGEJA | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Sawyer | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/02/2020 | 07/02/2021 | 07/02/2022 | 07/02/2023 | 07/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.58k | £60.29k | £36.67k | £58.03k | £73.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.64k | £54.04k | £48.64k | £47.54k | £66.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.03k | £33.51k | £7.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 February 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 February 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 February 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 February 2021 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2021 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 February 2020 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2020 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/08/2013
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN SMALL VILLAGES, INITIALLY IN THE COAST PROVINCE OF KENYA (BUT NOT LIMITED THERETO) BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL AND GENERAL WELFARE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Lindens
Stevenage
SG1 1ST
- Phone:
- 07737500501
- Email:
- info@justbeachild.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window