TOGETHER LIVERPOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Together Liverpool's aim is to support churches working with community groups wanting to tackle poverty, deprivation and disadvantage in their boroughs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,280 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Liverpool City
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wigan
Governance
- 10 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ELLEN LOUDON | Chair | 28 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Spittle | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Mary Randall | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Randall | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Hendry Spiers | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
peter Bull | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Bennett | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Bishop | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.78k | £135.90k | £120.57k | £71.68k | £130.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.12k | £56.62k | £134.13k | £93.05k | £96.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.32k | £2.28k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 AUG 2012 INCORPORATED 22/08/2012 INCORPORATED 23/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 MAR 2021 as amended on 02 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 1. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHRISTIAN BASED CHARITIES IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THEIR OBJECTS OR ANY ONE OF THEM, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND INFRASTRUCTURE PROVISION; AND 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST JAMES'HOUSE
20 ST. JAMES ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L1 7BY
- Phone:
- 01517099722
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window