Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST AND ST LUKE THE EVANGELIST, CLAY HILL, ENFIELD

Charity Number: 1151418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £136.14k £111.74k £98.42k £103.38k £145.86k
Total expenditure £145.04k £97.45k £107.88k £116.30k £175.97k
Income from government contracts N/A £1.99k £728 N/A £663
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A