THE YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE B'NAI BRITH HILLEL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the company is the promotion of the educational and religious welfare of Jewish students and graduates resident in Yorkshire and the Humber.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 21 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Mary Horn | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Adam Rose | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Daniel Dangoor | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Allan Taylor | Trustee | 12 April 2013 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY HARRIS | Trustee | 12 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 July 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 AUG 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF B'NAI B'RITH (HILLEL)FOUNDATION IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATIONAL AND RELIGIOUS WELFARE OF JEWISH STUDENTS AND GRADUATES ORDINARILY OR TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN YORKSHIRE AND THE HUMBER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Union of Jewish Students (UJS)
Amelie House
Maurice and Vivienne Wohl Campus
221 Golders Green Road
LONDON
NW11 9DQ
- Phone:
- 02074243288
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window