Financial history AIMING HIGH LONDON

Charity number: 1152228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £146.90k £438.79k £267.26k £199.55k £123.11k
Total expenditure £151.60k £366.22k £280.01k £162.03k £115.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.22k N/A N/A N/A