Parkgate Society

Charity Number: 503718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

ILLUSTRATED TALKS ON TOPICS OF INTEREST TO MEMBERS DISCUSSION WITH LOCAL AUTHORITY ON CONSERVATION AND PLANNING ISSUES PROMOTING THE PARKGATE CONSERVATION AREA

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £4,391
Total expenditure: £5,845

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PARKGATE SOCIETY (Working name)
  • PARKGATE AND DISTRICT SOCIETY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bryan Lecky Chair 11 February 2016
None on record
Robert Richard Toomey Trustee 18 September 2023
None on record
Marple Brenda Melissa Trustee 18 September 2023
None on record
TIMOTHY JAMES MARSHALL Trustee 11 September 2023
None on record
Paul Thompson Trustee 11 September 2023
None on record
Walter Frederick Cotton Trustee 11 March 2020
None on record
Dr Peter Enevoldson Trustee 16 September 2019
None on record
Derek Haylock Trustee 06 February 2015
None on record
ALAN PASSMORE Trustee 19 April 2013
THE WIRRAL SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.00k £1.62k £3.55k £2.79k £4.39k
Total expenditure £2.86k £798 £3.75k £1.79k £5.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 26 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 06 February 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 06 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 Woodlands Road
Parkgate
Neston
CH64 6RT
Phone:
01513362917