TRANSCONTINENTAL SCHOOL INNOVATION ALLIANCE (TSIA)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity ceased to operate on 31st October 2018. It previously provided educational support services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- India
- United States
Governance
- 03 June 2013: Standard registration
- 17 July 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 17 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1087486 MANSION HOUSE SCHOLARSHIP SCHEME
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/10/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.21k | £81.18k | £56.16k | £96.40k | £10.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.62k | £78.18k | £51.90k | £113.17k | £17.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 27 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 29 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 29 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 08 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 08 June 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CHARITY FUNDED EXPERT SERVICES AND PROGRAMMES TO SCHOOLS IN THE UK AND INTERNATIONALLY, BY IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: - CREATING INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL PARTNERSHIPS EXCHANGING IDEAS AND EDUCATIONAL METHODS - THE PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF BOTH SCHOOL PRINCIPALS AND TEACHERS IN INTERNATIONAL AND INTERCULTURAL GOOD PRACTICES, AWARENESS, EXCHANGE AND UNDERSTANDING - SHARING AND CO-CREATE EFFECTIVE TEACHING PRACTICE TO ACCELERATE SCHOOL IMPROVEMENT AND ENRICH EXPERIENCES - TO RAISE STUDENT ATTAINMENT, ACHIEVEMENT, ASPIRATION AND AMBITION BY PROVIDING STUDENT RESOURCES, LINKS AND EXCHANGES TO AND THROUGH INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL PARTNERSHIPS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window