Financial history KINGDON HOUSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1152091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £79.50k £25.10k £40.67k £32.60k £33.02k
Total expenditure £51.01k £48.99k £32.61k £31.37k £38.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.47k £15.87k N/A £1.07k