KINGDON HOUSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manage and maintain Kingdon House Community Association for the benefit of all the residents of Tavistock and District
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £1,071 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 17 May 2013: Standard registration
- 30 June 2014: Funds received from 271972 KINGDON HOUSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- KHCA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Jones | Chair | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Boyer | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Whettem | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HOUGHTON | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Johnson | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.50k | £25.10k | £40.67k | £32.60k | £33.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.01k | £48.99k | £32.61k | £31.37k | £38.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.47k | £15.87k | N/A | £1.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/04/2013
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TAVISTOCK AND DISTRICT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. C) PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingdon House Community Association
Kingdon House
Pym Street
TAVISTOCK
PL19 0AW
- Phone:
- 01822615259
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window