HULL UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION LIMITED

Charity number: 1152549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Hull University Union Limited is the Students' Union of the University of Hull. Our main aim is to help provide the best possible experience to our students whilst they are at University. This includes their education and extramural activites./ Further details are available on http//www.hullstudent.com.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Kingston Upon Hull City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 2013: Standard registration
  • 05 December 2015: Funds received from 1141201 HULL UNIVERSITY UNION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HULL UNIVERSITY UNION LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sara Webb Chair 07 March 2019
None on record
James John McMillan Trustee 17 April 2025
None on record
Tracy Jane Charlish Trustee 17 April 2025
None on record
Simon Merriweather Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Chibuike Francis Ani Trustee 12 July 2024
None on record
Ejimchi Collins Peter-Dumbili Trustee 12 July 2024
None on record
Robert James Finnis Trustee 15 September 2023
None on record
Helen Alexander Duncan Trustee 06 July 2023
None on record
MATTHEW BURMAN LLOYD Trustee 10 March 2022
STAFFORDSHIRE WINTER SPORTS CLUB
Received: On time
PETERBOROUGH WINTER SPORTS CLUB
Received: On time
BISON IN THE COMMUNITY
Received: On time
WEST MIDLANDS WINTER SPORTS CLUB LIMITED
Charity reporting is overdue by 1102 days
Philip Graham Dolling Trustee 24 January 2022
THE NATIONAL MUSEUM OF THE ROYAL NAVY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.55m £3.32m £5.28m £6.45m £7.25m
Total expenditure £4.44m £3.27m £5.83m £6.41m £7.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £412.52k £28.35k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.48m £1.53m £1.43m £1.48m £1.59m
Income - Other trading activities £2.49m £1.36m £3.53m £4.62m £5.21m
Income - Charitable activities £313.40k £245.87k £250.74k £300.00k £285.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £33.43k £28.29k £32.72k £49.78k £73.95k
Income - Other £227.03k £161.07k £39.23k £962 £94.34k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.06m £1.67m £2.49m £2.24m £2.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.38m £1.60m £3.34m £4.18m £4.66m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £103.99k £188.83k £69.91k £39.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Own use assets £493.71k £1.52m £207.49k £574.07k £1.03m
Long-term investments £1.15m £130.90k £1.30m £1.33m £1.33m
Other assets £1.21m £1.49m £1.50m £1.05m £787.75k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 -£487.98k -£441.35k -£324.60k
Total liabilities £455.95k £548.34k £456.72k £441.31k £431.57k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 13 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 13 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 16 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 18 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 19 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Student Central
University of Hull
Cottingham Road
Hull
HU6 7RX
Phone:
01482466255