Trustees HESWALL U3A
Charity number: 1152217
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jeremy Playfer | Chair | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Rowley | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Enid Grant | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Simon Cooper | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Maddock | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Dibben | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Raymond John Allan | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Jones | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Adlard | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bill Ashburner | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Ashburner | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.