CHESTER VOLUNTARY ACTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chester Voluntary Action is a local support and development organisation which promotes and supports voluntary action in the local authority area of Cheshire West and Chester through the provision of our core services and those of our Volunteer Centre to local third sector organisations and to individual members of the public interested in volunteering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 25 November 1974: Standard registration
- 24 November 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 24 November 2011: Funds transferred to 1136465 Cheshire West Voluntary Action
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.94k | £205.04k | £159.56k | £265.86k | £301.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £279.24k | £249.40k | £177.00k | £222.36k | £268.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 14 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 15 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 15 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 13 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 13 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 OCTOBER 1973 AMENDED 4 JULY 1983 AS AMENDED 4TH NOVEMBER 2003 AND 19 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: A)TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF CHESHIRE WEST AND CHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS [HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS B)TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AOB; PROVIDED THAT IN CARRYING OUT THESE CHARITABLE PURPOSES, THE CHARITY WILL SEEK TO CHALLENGE ALL FORMS OF OPPRESSION AND INEQUALITY AND TO GIVE PRIORITY TO WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHOSE FULL PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY IS LIMITED BY ECONOMIC, POLITICAL AND SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF CHESHIRE WEST AND CHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window