RENAISSANCE PUBLISHING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting Jewish culture
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 July 2013: Standard registration
- JEWISH RENAISSANCE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Gordon | Chair | 21 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hester Abrams | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Spencer Debson | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Benmayer | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lady Collins Patti Langton | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lancaster | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.48k | £205.49k | £333.18k | £303.29k | £438.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.71k | £221.18k | £291.00k | £303.86k | £458.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 APR 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF RENAISSANCE PUBLISHING ("OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON ISSUES RELATED TO JEWISH CULTURE, ARTS, HERITAGE, HISTORY, RELIGION AND COMMUNITY BY PROMOTING, PUBLISHING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE, PUBLICATIONS, ARTICLES AND INFORMATION AND BY ORGANISING EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES INCLUDING LECTURES, DISCUSSIONS, LEARNING EVENTS AND CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL TOURS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jewish Renaissance
353-359 Finchley Road
London
NW3 6ET
- Phone:
- 02077945254
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window