NEWARK COMMUNITY FIRST AID

Charity number: 1152694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide first aid training and first aid event cover in Newark on Trent and surrounding areas mainly within 15 miles of the town centre. Our community training and community/charitable event cover is provided free of charge - donations appreciated. Workplace training and cover for commercial events is provided at inexpensive rates. These services are provided by our volunteers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £95,337
Total expenditure: £70,424

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 2013: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • NCFA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr MARGARET MCDOUGALD Chair 09 June 2013
BARBARA MAY FOUNDATION UK
Received: On time
Clare Owen Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Sajidah Ahmad Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Margaret Anne Shaw Trustee 10 March 2022
None on record
Dr Jane Elizabeth Selwyn Trustee 07 October 2019
THE MARY ELIZABETH SIEBEL CHARITY
Received: On time
Mark Andrew Stafford Trustee 21 September 2015
None on record
PETER SMITH Trustee 09 June 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £72.02k £43.80k £133.02k £103.08k £95.34k
Total expenditure £109.17k £33.82k £151.17k £85.51k £70.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.20k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 05 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 05 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 11 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 20 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 01 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 MOUNT ROAD
BALDERTON
NEWARK
NG24 3HF
Phone:
07973904808