CONGREGATIONAL FEDERATION (EAST MIDLANDS AREA)

Charity number: 503795
Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE OBJECT OF THE FEDERATION IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £13,190
Total expenditure: £2,905

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Central Bedfordshire
  • Derbyshire
  • Leicestershire
  • Lincolnshire
  • Northamptonshire
  • Nottinghamshire
  • Rutland
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CONGREGATIONAL FEDERATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Stella Elizabeth Wallace-Tween Chair 01 March 2016
None on record
Rev Barry Osborne Trustee 01 March 2016
ACTION FOR CHRIST
Received: On time
MISSION FOR CHRIST
Received: 31 days late
MICHAEL HOCKADAY Trustee
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN LEICESTERSHIRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.28k £5.02k £6.39k £4.79k £13.19k
Total expenditure £16.07k £8.92k £12.42k £6.92k £2.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
20 TEBBUTT LODGE
CLARENCE STREET
MARKET HARBOROUGH
LE16 7QH
Phone:
07720 322213