Accounts and annual returns FELLOWSHIP CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1152060
Charity reporting is overdue by 1157 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 426 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 426 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 792 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 792 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1157 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1157 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 March 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required