Financial history TY CERDD - MUSIC CENTRE WALES

Charity Number: 1152853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £420.83k £502.29k £589.84k £578.65k £555.98k
Total expenditure £424.56k £439.64k £553.81k £551.68k £572.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £206.78k £221.78k £206.78k £239.38k £209.88k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £30 £7.47k £5.24k £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £502.26k £580.71k £572.09k £554.55k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £1.67k £1.33k £1.43k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £5.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £439.64k £553.81k £551.68k £572.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.83k £7.25k £6.17k £6.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0