COLEG SIR GAR

Charity number: 1152522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Educational Services

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Carmarthenshire
  • Ceredigion

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Wint Trustee 19 February 2025
None on record
Angharad Lloyd Beynon Trustee 19 February 2025
None on record
Estelle Vanessa Hitchon Trustee 19 February 2025
None on record
Dr Michael Jeanne Childs Trustee 19 February 2025
None on record
Rhys Taylor Trustee 01 September 2024
BUILDING COMMUNITIES TRUSTEE LIMITED
Received: On time
Sharron Kim Lusher MBE DL Trustee 01 September 2024
TENBY AND COUNTY TRUST
Recently registered
Abigail Jayne Salini Trustee 23 March 2023
COLEG CEREDIGION
Received: On time
Mike Theodoulou Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Ben Francis Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Jacqui Kedward Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Louis Dare Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Richard John Williams Trustee 06 October 2022
COLEG CEREDIGION
Received: On time
Alan Smith Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Erica Cassin Trustee 05 February 2021
None on record
Dr Andrew Cornish Trustee 01 August 2018
COLEG CEREDIGION
Received: On time
John Edge Trustee 13 December 2017
COLEG CEREDIGION
Received: On time
Huw Davies Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £35.49m £40.45m £46.64m £46.65m £46.14m
Total expenditure £36.76m £39.96m £45.52m £47.08m £45.41m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.74m £24.59m £34.01m £34.51m £35.08m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £35.45m £40.44m £46.61m £46.18m £45.38m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £27.00k £5.00k £34.00k £468.00k £754.00k
Income - Other £11.00k £4.00k £1.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £36.76m £39.96m £45.52m £47.08m £45.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £59.00k £58.00k £62.00k £65.00k £67.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Own use assets £31.61m £31.82m £31.50m £30.09m £28.78m
Long-term investments £265.00k £303.00k £254.00k £247.00k £236.00k
Other assets £12.15m £15.95m £23.15m £20.22m £18.97m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£30.09m -£27.68m -£8.21m £0 £0
Total liabilities £20.33m £21.63m £25.02m £20.27m £17.60m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2023 29 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 29 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 26 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 26 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 21 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 21 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Coleg Sir Gar
Graig Campus
Sandy Road
LLANELLI
Dyfed
SA15 4DN
Phone:
01554748000